House | 02/12/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2455. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 247. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2024 8:15AM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Subcommittee reassigned: Lohse, Deyoe and Srinivas. H.J. 170. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Subcommittee: Graber, Deyoe and Srinivas. H.J. 170. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 138. |