LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF2155
Action History
IA
Iowa House Bill HF2155
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa House Bill HF2155
Action History
House
02/08/2024
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2395.
House
02/06/2024
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 207.
House
01/31/2024
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
House
01/29/2024
Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2024 4:00PM House Lounge.
House
01/29/2024
Subcommittee: Andrews, Matson and Wilz, H. H.J. 153.
House
01/25/2024
Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 140.