House | 03/27/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 690. | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2492. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 247. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2024 8:15AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Subcommittee: Lohse, Srinivas and Young. H.J. 171. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 140. |