House | 02/19/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2580. | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 282. | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2024 2:30PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2024 12:30PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Subcommittee: Lohse, Jones and Meyer, B. H.J. 160. | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 151. |