House
|
04/19/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 925.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 712.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 708.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 708.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 523.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 496.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Subcommittee: Driscoll, Webster, and Winckler. S.J. 401.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 375.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 375.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 380.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 93, nays 1. H.J. 378.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar. H.J. 273.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 273.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2024 12:30PM RM 19.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Subcommittee: Dunwell, Collins and Gjerde. H.J. 204.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 166.
|
|
|