House | 04/11/2023 | Withdrawn. H.J. 805. | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 355. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 365. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2023 8:00AM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Subcommittee: Osmundson, Hora and Steckman. H.J. 302. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 257. |