House
|
05/01/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 936.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 934.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 612.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 585.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 580.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Substituted for SF 2207. S.J. 579.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 496.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Read first time, attached to SF 2207. S.J. 390.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 390.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 397.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 392.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Amendment H-8035 adopted. H.J. 391.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment H-8035 filed. H.J. 364.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 178.
|
|
|