House
|
04/29/2024
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 772.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 612.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 585.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 585.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Substituted for SF 2294. S.J. 584.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 495.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 380.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read first time, attached to SF 2294. S.J. 341.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 341.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 337.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Explanations of votes. H.J. 336.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 335.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 316.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 91, nays 0. H.J. 304.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 179.
|
|
|