Senate | 03/06/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: []. | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 496. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Alons, and Wahls. S.J. 418. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read first time, referred to Technology. S.J. 375. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Message from House. S.J. 375. | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Immediate message. H.J. 380. | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Passed House, yeas 94, nays 1. H.J. 371. | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 180. |