House
|
05/01/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 936.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 935.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 906.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 942.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 1. S.J. 942.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Amendment S-5223 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 942.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Substituted for SF 2300. S.J. 941.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Read first time, attached to SF 2300. S.J. 909.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 909.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 891.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 86, nays 5. H.J. 883.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Amendments H-8011 and H-8176 adopted. H.J. 882.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Amendment H-8176 filed. H.J. 555.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Amendment H-8011 filed. H.J. 287.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 182.
|
|
|