House
|
05/03/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 934.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 612.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 590.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 590.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 511.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2024 12:30PM Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 495.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Subcommittee: Reichman, Salmon, and Wahls. S.J. 402.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 380.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read first time, referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 341.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 341.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 337.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Explanations of votes. H.J. 336.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 335.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 316.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 91, nays 0. H.J. 315.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 191.
|
|
|