House | 04/10/2024 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 773. | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 772. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Message from Senate. H.J. 702. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Immediate message. S.J. 682. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 680. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Substituted for SF 2264. S.J. 680. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536. | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 496. | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Explanations of votes. H.J. 482. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Read first time, attached to SF 2264. S.J. 405. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Message from House. S.J. 405. | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Immediate message. H.J. 427. | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0. H.J. 416. | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 193. |