House
|
04/19/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 925.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 836.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 792.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 98, nays 0. H.J. 785.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendment H-8263. H.J. 785.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate amendment H-8263 filed. H.J. 714.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 702.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 686.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 686.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Amendment S-5106 filed, adopted. S.J. 685.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Substituted for SF 2382. S.J. 685.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 495.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 380.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read first time, attached to SF 2382. S.J. 342.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 342.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 337.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Explanations of votes. H.J. 336.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 335.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 316.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 91, nays 0. H.J. 311.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 194.
|
|
|