House | 04/15/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 792. | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2688. | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 738. | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2024 12:00PM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Subcommittee: Wood, Mommsen and Scheetz. H.J. 451. | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 237. |