House | 03/27/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 690. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2669. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 625. | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2024 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Subcommittee: Sexton, Bloomingdale and Gjerde. H.J. 536. | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 361. | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 241. |