House
|
04/19/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 925.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 841.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 803.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 73, nays 24. H.J. 801.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendment H-8315. H.J. 801.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Senate amendment H-8315 filed. H.J. 781.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 779.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 815.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 814.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Amendment S-5129 adopted. S.J. 814.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Amendment S-5129 filed. S.J. 782.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 458.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 495.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2024 10:00AM Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Dawson. S.J. 402.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 351.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 351.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 335.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 68, nays 27. H.J. 326.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Amendments H-8018 and H-8020 adopted. H.J. 326.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Amendments H-8018 and H-8020 filed. H.J. 318.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 243.
|
|
|