House
|
05/16/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 934.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 718.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 734.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 733.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 540.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2024 11:30AM Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Giddens, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 442.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 497.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 496.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 421.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 421.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 483.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 449.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 437.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Amendment H-8075 adopted. H.J. 436.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Amendment H-8075 filed. H.J. 428.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 243.
|
|
|