House | 03/27/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 690. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2668. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 624. | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2024 12:00PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Subcommittee: Lohse, Ehlert and Fry. H.J. 451. | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Referred to Appropriations. H.J. 428. | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Amendment H-8050 filed. H.J. 398. | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Amendment H-8022 filed. H.J. 318. | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 254. |