House | 04/02/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 713. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2666. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 625. | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2024 12:30PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Subcommittee: Wulf, Jones and Nielsen. H.J. 362. | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 263. |