House | 04/09/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 757. | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2686. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 714. | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/27/2024 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Subcommittee reassigned: Kaufmann, Best and Nielsen. H.J. 585. | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Best and Jacoby. H.J. 577. | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 450. | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 279. |