House
|
05/03/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 938.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 934.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 762.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 794.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0. S.J. 793.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 525.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2024 9:30AM Room 217 Conference Room.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Subcommittee: Lofgren, Giddens, and Webster. S.J. 453.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 508.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read first time, referred to Transportation. S.J. 428.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 428.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Explanations of votes. H.J. 497.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 481.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 84, nays 8. H.J. 479.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 289.
|
|
|