House | 04/16/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 815. | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | SF 2385 substituted. H.J. 805. | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Amendment H-8324 filed, adopted. H.J. 804. | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Amendments H-8296, H-8297, H-8298, H-8299, H-8300, H-8303, H-8304 and H-8308 to amendment H-8279 out of order. H.J. 804. | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Amendment H-8279 withdrawn. H.J. 804. | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Amendments H-8297, H-8298, H-8299, H-8300, H-8303, H-8304, and H-8308 filed. H.J. 775. | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Amendment H-8296 filed. H.J. 759. | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Amendment H-8279 filed. H.J. 747. | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587. | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 290. |