House
|
06/01/2023
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 975.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 1031.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 1030.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 592.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2023 9:00AM Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Subcommittee: Klimesh, Dickey, and T. Taylor. S.J. 410.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 376.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 348.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 348.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 351.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 99, nays 0. H.J. 349.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 283.
|
|
|