House | 03/26/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 681. | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2647. | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 539. | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2024 8:00AM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Subcommittee: Jones, Gjerde and Thompson, P. H.J. 362. | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 316. | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 291. |