House
|
05/03/2024
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 772.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 634.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 606.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 605.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Amendment S-5089 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 605.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 522.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2024 3:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 496.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Explanations of votes. H.J. 482.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Subcommittee: Webster, Knox, and Reichman. S.J. 419.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 406.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 406.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 427.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0. H.J. 405.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 293.
|
|
|