Senate | 03/12/2024 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2024 2:00PM Room G15. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Subcommittee: Garrett, J. Taylor, and Weiner. S.J. 509. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 506. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Message from House. S.J. 506. | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Immediate message. H.J. 554. | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 554. | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Passed House, yeas 60, nays 32. H.J. 553. | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 295. |