Senate | 03/19/2024 | Fiscal note. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Read first time, attached to SF 2380. S.J. 449. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Message from House. S.J. 449. | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Immediate message. H.J. 508. | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 508. | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Passed House, yeas 62, nays 35. H.J. 507. | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Amendment H-8091 adopted. H.J. 507. | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Motion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 506. | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-8091. H.J. 506. | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Point of order raised on amendment H-8091, ruled not germane. H.J. 506. | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Amendment H-8100, yeas 35, nays 62, lost. H.J. 505. | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Amendments H-8091 and H-8100 filed. H.J. 453. | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 295. |