LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF2616
Action History
IA
Iowa House Bill HF2616
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa House Bill HF2616
Action History
House
04/18/2024
Amendment H-8344 filed. H.J. 874.
House
04/09/2024
Amendments H-8282 and H-8289 filed. H.J. 759.
House
03/18/2024
Fiscal note.
House
03/18/2024
Amendment H-8215 filed. H.J. 608.
House
03/14/2024
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587.
House
02/19/2024
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 296.