Senate | 03/21/2024 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Amendment S-5073 filed. S.J. 562. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 562. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2024 11:00AM Room G15. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Quirmbach, and Salmon. S.J. 442. | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 497. | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 496. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 422. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Message from House. S.J. 422. | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 483. | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Immediate message. H.J. 449. | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Passed House, yeas 59, nays 35. H.J. 440. | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 297. |