LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF2629
Action History
IA
Iowa House Bill HF2629
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa House Bill HF2629
Action History
House
03/20/2024
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2670.
House
03/19/2024
Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 626.
House
03/12/2024
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
House
03/07/2024
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2024 12:30PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
House
03/06/2024
Subcommittee: Sexton, Forbes and Jones. H.J. 536.
House
02/26/2024
Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 384.