House
|
05/01/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 939.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 935.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 830.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 865.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 865.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Ways and Means calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 807.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 04/08/2024 2:30PM Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Subcommittee: Bousselot, Brown, and Petersen. S.J. 727.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 690.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 638.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 638.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 680.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 670.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 534.
|
|
|