House
|
05/17/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 939.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
NOBA: Final
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 935.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 909.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 891.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 55, nays 35. H.J. 888.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendment H-8347. H.J. 888.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Senate amendment H-8347 filed. H.J. 874.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 845.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 883.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 34, nays 13. S.J. 882.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Amendment S-5177 adopted, as amended. S.J. 882.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Amendment S-5191 to S-5177 filed, adopted. S.J. 882.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Placed on Appropriations calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Amendment S-5177 filed. S.J. 871.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 871.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 04/16/2024 8:30AM Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Subcommittee: Zumbach, Kraayenbrink, and Winckler. S.J. 657.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
NOBA: House Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 535.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 535.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 585.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 59, nays 35. H.J. 584.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Amendment H-8200B, yeas 55, nays 39, adopted. H.J. 583.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Amendment H-8200A, yeas 94, nays 0, adopted. H.J. 582.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Amendment H-8203 to amendment H-8200, yeas 53, nays 41, filed, adopted. H.J. 581.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Amendment H-8201 withdrawn. H.J. 581.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Amendments H-8200 and H-8201 filed. H.J. 578.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
NOBA: House Full Approps
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 541.
|
|
|