Senate | 04/18/2024 | Placed on Ways and Means calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 895. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/10/2024 8:00AM Senate Lounge. | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 737. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Subcommittee: Driscoll, Sweeney, and T. Taylor. S.J. 741. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 722. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Message from House. S.J. 722. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Immediate message. H.J. 713. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 713. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 706. | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 627. |