House
|
04/19/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 928.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 925.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 783.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 831.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 1. S.J. 828.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Ways and Means calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 807.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 04/04/2024 8:30AM Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Subcommittee: Koelker, Cournoyer, and Winckler. S.J. 727.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 666.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 666.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 690.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0. H.J. 688.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 628.
|
|
|