House
|
05/17/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 940.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 935.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 906.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 939.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 42, nays 4. S.J. 939.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Amendment S-5205 lost, as amended. S.J. 938.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Amendment S-5229 to S-5205 filed, adopted. S.J. 938.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Amendment S-5205 filed. S.J. 937.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Amendment S-5183 withdrawn. S.J. 937.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Substituted for SF 2402. S.J. 937.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Amendment S-5183 filed. S.J. 896.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Read first time, attached to SF 2402. S.J. 745.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 745.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 738.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 730.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 90, nays 4. H.J. 723.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Amendment H-8265 adopted. H.J. 722.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Amendment H-8265 filed. H.J. 715.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 685.
|
|
|