House
|
05/09/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 940.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
NOBA: Final
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 935.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
NOBA: House Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 893.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 922.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 921.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Amendment S-5227 filed, lost. S.J. 921.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Amendment S-5226 filed, lost. S.J. 920.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Amendment S-5225 filed, lost. S.J. 919.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Amendment S-5224 filed, lost. S.J. 919.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Substituted for SF 2434. S.J. 918.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Read first time, attached to SF 2434. S.J. 910.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 910.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 891.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 59, nays 32. H.J. 880.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Amendment H-8367 adopted. H.J. 880.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Amendment H-8376 to amendment H-8367, yeas 35, nays 56, filed, lost. H.J. 879.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Amendment H-8367 filed. H.J. 874.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
NOBA: House Full Approps
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 794.
|
|
|