House
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 952.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 951.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 890.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 888.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 884.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Substituted for SF 420. S.J. 884.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 596.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Attached to SF 420. S.J. 429.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Commerce. S.J. 416.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 378.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 378.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 407.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 394.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 300.
|
|
|