Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2023 8:30AM Room 217 Conference Room.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 596.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Subcommittee: Salmon, Kraayenbrink, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 425.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Education. S.J. 416.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 379.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 379.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 407.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 69, nays 26. H.J. 405.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 405.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1023, yeas 36, nays 59. H.J. 404.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Point of order raised on amendment H-1023, ruled not germane. H.J. 404.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Amendment H-1023 filed. H.J. 386.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 354.
|
|
|