Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment S-3139 filed. S.J. 838.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 747.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Amendment S-3111 filed. S.J. 726.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 726.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/27/2023 1:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Subcommittee: Bousselot, Knox, and Zaun. S.J. 697.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 700.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 653.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 653.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 726.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 706.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 93, nays 1. H.J. 695.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amendment H-1141 filed, adopted. H.J. 695.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 369.
|
|
|