House | 05/05/2023 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1037. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Brown, and T. Taylor. S.J. 842. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 771. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Message from House. S.J. 771. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Immediate message. H.J. 805. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Passed House, yeas 97, nays 1. H.J. 804. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Amendment H-1197 adopted. H.J. 804. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Motion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 804. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1197, yeas 65, nays 33. H.J. 803. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Point of order raised on amendment H-1197, ruled not germane. H.J. 803. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Amendment H-1197 filed. H.J. 803. | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 369. |