House | 04/11/2023 | Withdrawn. H.J. 805. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 672. | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 674. | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2023 12:00PM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Subcommittee: Osmundson, Johnson and Kurth. H.J. 560. | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 370. |