House | 03/16/2023 | Withdrawn. H.J. 673. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 566. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 472. | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2023 3:00PM RM 304. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Subcommittee: Fry, Forbes and Lundgren. H.J. 413. | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 377. |