House | 04/11/2023 | Withdrawn. H.J. 805. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 572. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 445. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2023 8:00AM RM 19. | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Subcommittee: Wulf, Gjerde and Mommsen. H.J. 417. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 387. |