House
|
05/10/2023
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 1040.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 1014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 1013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 1006.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 978.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 950.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 88, nays 6. H.J. 929.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendment H-1280. H.J. 929.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate amendment H-1280 filed. H.J. 902.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 900.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 910.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 1. S.J. 909.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment S-3159 adopted, as amended. S.J. 909.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment S-3167 to S-3159 filed, adopted. S.J. 909.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Amendment S-3159 filed. S.J. 897.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 747.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 648.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/15/2023 3:30PM Room 217 Conference Room.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Subcommittee: Driscoll, Jochum, and Koelker. S.J. 570.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred to State Government. S.J. 543.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 539.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 539.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 539.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 90, nays 8. H.J. 531.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Amendment H-1059, yeas 30, nays 68, lost. H.J. 531.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Amendment H-1059 filed. H.J. 508.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 411.
|
|
|