House | 03/21/2023 | Withdrawn. H.J. 706. | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 657. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 497. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2023 3:00PM RM 304.1. | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Subcommittee: Jones, Nordman and Olson. H.J. 418. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 411. |