LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF427
Action History
IA
Iowa House Bill HF427
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa House Bill HF427
Action History
House
05/10/2023
Tabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 3-0.
House
03/15/2023
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/16/2023 8:30AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
House
03/09/2023
Subcommittee: Wood, Fry, Matson, Meyer, A. and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 597.
House
02/24/2023
Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 422.