House | 04/11/2023 | Withdrawn. H.J. 805. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 675. | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 674. | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2023 12:00PM RM 304.1. | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Forbes and Kniff McCulla. H.J. 561. | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Rereferred to Ways and Means. H.J. 434. | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 423. |