House
|
06/01/2023
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 1040.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 1014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 1013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 1006.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 978.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 950.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 93, nays 1. H.J. 926.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendment H-1313. H.J. 926.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate amendment H-1313 filed. H.J. 913.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 910.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 958.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 956.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment S-3182 filed, adopted. S.J. 955.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Substituted for SF 518. S.J. 955.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Read first time, attached to SF 518. S.J. 539.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 539.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 539.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 98, nays 0. H.J. 521.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 423.
|
|
|