LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF46
Action History
IA
Iowa House Bill HF46
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa House Bill HF46
Action History
House
04/10/2023
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 702.
House
04/05/2023
Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 778.
House
01/25/2023
Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
House
01/24/2023
Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2023 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
House
01/18/2023
Subcommittee: Boden, Isenhart and Thompson, P. H.J. 125.
House
01/12/2023
Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 79.