House
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 952.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 951.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 901.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 860.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 886.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 869.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendment H-1255. H.J. 869.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate amendment H-1255 filed. H.J. 866.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 864.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 822.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 819.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment S-3130 filed, adopted. S.J. 819.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment S-3144 filed, lost. S.J. 818.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 746.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 716.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/28/2023 12:30PM Room 217 Conference Room.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Subcommittee: Rowley, Petersen, and Shipley. S.J. 697.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 694.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 694.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 725.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 93, nays 2. H.J. 719.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Amendment H-1154 adopted, as amended. H.J. 719.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Amendment H-1158 to amendment H-1154 filed, adopted. H.J. 718.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amendment H-1154 filed. H.J. 710.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 433.
|
|
|